OK HB1246 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1246
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 84-19)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Approved by Governor 03/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 84-19)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Approved by Governor 03/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; dispensers of controlled dangerous substances; allowing use of a Social Security number when a state-issued identification card is expired; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; dispensers of controlled dangerous substances; allowing use of a Social Security number when a state-issued identification card is expired; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 03/11/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-03-08 | House | Emergency added |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Fugate |
2021-03-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1246 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Approved by Governor 03/11/2021