OK HB1228 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring State Commissioner of Health to publish data; resulting from inspection of food service establishments; available through certain portal; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring State Commissioner of Health to publish data; resulting from inspection of food service establishments; available through certain portal; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Quinn |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |