OK HB1226 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Eminent domain; requiring property owner be given right of first refusal; specifying how to determine resale price; effective date.
Title
Eminent domain; requiring property owner be given right of first refusal; specifying how to determine resale price; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Table Amendment (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Table Amendment (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | coauthored by Marlatt, Sparks | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 14 | |
2011-05-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Title restored | |
2011-05-16 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-10 | Conference granted, SCs named Simpson, Sykes, Brecheen, Brinkley, Ballenger, Paddack | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-28 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | First Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft, Walker | |
2011-03-02 | General Order | |
2011-02-22 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Ritze | |
2011-02-22 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |