OK HB1225 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; initiative petitions; requiring statement of funding sources for certain measures; effective date.
Title
Initiative and referendum; initiative petitions; requiring statement of funding sources for certain measures; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House: REJECT SENATE AMMENDMENT (Y: 56 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Table Amendment (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Table Amendment (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Died in conference | |
2011-05-10 | Conference granted, SCs named Simpson, Johnson (Rob), David, Allen, Burrage, Garrison | |
2011-05-02 | Ayes: 56 Nays: 27 | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Motion expired | |
2011-04-26 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Simpson | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-31 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-01 | First Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 46 | |
2011-02-28 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2011-02-28 | General Order | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 510 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 1 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |