OK HB1214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; clarifying certain license eligibility requirement and definition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; clarifying certain license eligibility requirement and definition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-05-15HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-03-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Miller
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Newton
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1214&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1214%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1214%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1214%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1214%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1214%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1214%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1214_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1214_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback