OK HB1212 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Amusements and sports; requiring certain screenings of participants; effective date.
Title
Amusements and sports; requiring certain screenings of participants; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-25 | SA's received | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-02-22 | First Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-21 | General Order | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McNiel | |
2011-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |