OK HB1199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Contracts; surrender of tangible personal property; cancellation of payment; vehicles; certificates of title; effective date.
Title
Contracts; surrender of tangible personal property; cancellation of payment; vehicles; certificates of title; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee