OK HB1197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; creating the Children of Incarcerated Parents Task Force; effective date; emergency.
Title
Children; creating the Children of Incarcerated Parents Task Force; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor 04/04/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-29 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-29 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-29 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-03-29 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-23 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading | |
2011-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman, Peterson, Walker, Proctor | |
2011-03-01 | General Order | |
2011-02-21 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |