OK HB1191 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1191
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; adding artificially implanted medical device to advance directive form; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; adding artificially implanted medical device to advance directive form; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick West [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Silk, Sykes, Griffin, Smalley, Pugh, Floyd, Bass |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 26 |
2017-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1191 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference