OK HB1181 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1181
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health; treatment and medication; inmates committed to a special care unit; modifying location; effective date.
Title
Mental Health; treatment and medication; inmates committed to a special care unit; modifying location; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Approved by Governor 04/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush |
2019-03-12 | House | Remove Representative Bush as principal House author and substitute with Representative CrosswhiteHader |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1181 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019