OK HB1162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Process servers; prohibiting certain persons from applying, reapplying or obtaining process server license; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Process servers; prohibiting certain persons from applying, reapplying or obtaining process server license; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseSA's received
2019-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
2019-04-17SenateTitle restored
2019-04-17SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-09SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 33
2019-03-13HouseAyes: 60 Nays: 3
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Rules
2019-02-26HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Worthen
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1162&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1162%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1162%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1162%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1162%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1162%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1162%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1162_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1162_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback