OK HB1160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; educational expenses; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; educational expenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1160 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - Title stricken