OK HB1149 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1149

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation; designating various memorial roads and bridges; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; designating various memorial roads and bridges; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2017
2017-05-04HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-04HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2017-05-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Condit
2017-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-18HouseSA's received
2017-04-18SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-17SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2017-04-17SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-04SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2017-03-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2017-03-08HouseAmended
2017-03-08HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-03-08HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2017-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-02-08HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Vaughan
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1149 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6916002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698254Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698258Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698260Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698262Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1149&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1149%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1149%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1149%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1149%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1149%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1149%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1149%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1149%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1149_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1149_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback