OK HB1149 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1149
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; designating various memorial roads and bridges; effective date.
Title
Transportation; designating various memorial roads and bridges; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amended |
2017-03-08 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-08 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Vaughan |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1149 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1600 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |