OK HB1148 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; prohibiting certain contracts for sale of real property; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; prohibiting certain contracts for sale of real property; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/03/2021
2021-04-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-29HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-28HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-28HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2021-04-28HouseSA's read, adopted
2021-04-15HouseSA's received
2021-04-15SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2021-04-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2021-03-02SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-02HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-01HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
2021-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-16HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2021-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Osburn
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1148&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1148%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1148%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1148%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1148%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1148%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1148%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1148%20CA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1148%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB1148%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1148%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1148%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1148_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1148_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback