OK HB1138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1138
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; requiring initiation of stop-payment; authorizing issuance of second check; effective date.
Title
Public finance; requiring initiation of stop-payment; authorizing issuance of second check; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-16 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Fetgatter and substitute with Representative Pfeiffer |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Kidd |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 30 |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1138 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance