OK HB1137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; vehicle charging stations; per-location tax credit; maximum credits; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; vehicle charging stations; per-location tax credit; maximum credits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-12 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1137 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee