OK HB1137 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; vehicle charging stations; per-location tax credit; maximum credits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; vehicle charging stations; per-location tax credit; maximum credits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 25
2021-03-12HouseTitle stricken
2021-03-12HouseAmended
2021-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author)
2021-03-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
2021-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Fetgatter
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1137&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1137%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1137%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1137%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1137%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1137%20FULLPCS1%20AVERY%20FRIX-JBH.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1137%20FA1%20WALLACEKE-CC.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1137%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1137%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1137%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB1137%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1137_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback