OK HB1134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; Oklahoma Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; modifying amount of deduction from rent for repairs; effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; Oklahoma Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; modifying amount of deduction from rent for repairs; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1134 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary