OK HB1132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1132
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uncompensated Care Fund; creating the Uncompensated Care Fund; effective date.
Title
Uncompensated Care Fund; creating the Uncompensated Care Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20 |
2019-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1132 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee