OK HB1125 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage licenses; deleting issuance of marriage licenses; providing for marriage certificates and affidavits of common law marriage; effective date.
Title
Marriage licenses; deleting issuance of marriage licenses; providing for marriage certificates and affidavits of common law marriage; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion expired |
2015-03-10 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Russ |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 24 |
2015-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 152 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |