OK HB1124 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rural broadband; requiring the Corporation Commission promulgate rules and procedures for establishment of the State Broadband Deployment Grant Program; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural broadband; requiring the Corporation Commission promulgate rules and procedures for establishment of the State Broadband Deployment Grant Program; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseApproved by Governor 05/20/2021
2021-05-18HouseSent to Governor
2021-05-18SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-18HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-05-17HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-05-17HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2021-05-17HouseSA's read, adopted
2021-04-22HouseSA's received
2021-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2021-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2021-03-31SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-03-25SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2021-03-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 6
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bell
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass Technology Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Technology
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Phillips
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1124&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1124%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1124%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1124%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1124%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1124%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1124%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1124%20FA1%20PHILLIPSLO-JBH.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1124%20(4-19-21)%20(LEEWRIGHT)%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1124%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1124%20FA%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB1124%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1124%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1124%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1124_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1124_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback