OK HB1123 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State government; State Budget Policy Act of 2017; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; State Budget Policy Act of 2017; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-26HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-09-25HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2017-09-25HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback