OK HB1122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1122
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drug possession; providing for the preemption of certain laws of municipalities and political subdivisions; allowing for the establishment of municipal criminal courts of record; effective date.
Title
Drug possession; providing for the preemption of certain laws of municipalities and political subdivisions; allowing for the establishment of municipal criminal courts of record; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-03-20 | Senate | coauthored by Sanders |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 34 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |