OK HB1121 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1121

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic violence; creating the Domestic Violence Court Act of 2017; authorizing counties to establish and maintain domestic violence courts; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence; creating the Domestic Violence Court Act of 2017; authorizing counties to establish and maintain domestic violence courts; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/15/2017
2017-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3
2017-05-08HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
2017-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-26HouseSA's received
2017-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2017-04-25SenateTitle restored
2017-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-04-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-02-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-02-16HouseMotion expired
2017-02-14HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martinez
2017-02-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10
2017-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2017-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Biggs
2017-02-14HouseRemove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez
2017-02-14HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-08HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Biggs
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1121 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1121&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1121%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1121%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1121%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1121%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1121%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1121%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1121%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1121_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1121_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback