OK HB1118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; prohibiting the certification or employment of certain persons; effective date.
Title
Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; prohibiting the certification or employment of certain persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 33 |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1118 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard