OK HB1116 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State property; relating to easement and right-of-way grants; adding Department of Wildlife Conservation to exemption.
Title
State property; relating to easement and right-of-way grants; adding Department of Wildlife Conservation to exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 05/27/2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 3 CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 3 CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2016-05-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Biggs |
2016-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 21; Ayes: 65 Nays: 24 |
2016-05-20 | House | 3 CCR adopted |
2016-05-19 | House | 3 CCR submitted |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Further conference granted, GCCA |
2016-04-25 | House | 2 CCR adoption rescinded; CCR rejected; further conference requested, same conferees |
2015-05-22 | House | Laid over on Fourth Reading |
2015-05-22 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 62 Nays: 1 |
2015-05-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cleveland |
2015-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 49 Nays: 28 |
2015-05-21 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Further conference granted, GCCA |
2015-05-15 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2015-05-14 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2015-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Emergency not considered |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 31 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Considered |
2015-02-25 | House | Laid over |
2015-02-25 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cleveland |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |