OK HB1115 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure; authorizing use of certain chemical treatment for offenders who commit sexually violent offenses; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; authorizing use of certain chemical treatment for offenders who commit sexually violent offenses; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Olsen
2021-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2021-02-08HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative West (Rick)
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback