OK HB1114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; Public Competitive Building Act of 1974; modifying retainage on certain public contracts; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; Public Competitive Building Act of 1974; modifying retainage on certain public contracts; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-13HouseTitle restored
2019-05-13HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Pederson, Leewright, Newhouse, Stanislawski, Brooks, Young
2019-04-29HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Efficiency
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended, considered and deferred
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-04-02SenateWithdrawn from General Government committee
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0
2019-03-13HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-06HouseAuthored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author)
2019-02-06HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1114&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1114%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1114%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1114%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1114%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1114%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1114%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1114%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1114%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1114_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1114_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback