OK HB1114 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1114
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 56-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; increasing teacher minimum salary schedule; effective date.
Title
Schools; increasing teacher minimum salary schedule; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2017-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Cockroft, Babinec, Mulready, McEntire, Downing, Sanders, Dunlap, Kerbs, McEachin, Lawson, Hilbert, Sears, Osburn (Mike), West (Tammy), Martinez, Montgomery, Bush, Teague, Frix, McCall, Jordan, Ford, McBride, Hall, Fetgatter, Nollan, Faught, Baker, Osborn (Leslie), McDugle, Kannady, Caldwell, ODonnell, Wright, West (Josh), Moore, Wallace, McDaniel, Cleveland, West (Kevin), Roberts (Dustin), Derby, Russ, Coody, Roberts (Sean), Gann, Brumbaugh, Thomsen, Hoskin, Tadlock, Pfeiffer, Condit |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Calvey, Strohm, Martin |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Rogers |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1114 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski