OK HB1109 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; peer recovery support specialists; effective date.
Title
Mental health; peer recovery support specialists; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named David, Crain, Griffin, Treat, Burrage, Ivester |
2013-05-06 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Public Health |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 16 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 2 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 326 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 704 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |