OK HB1104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1104

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; providing an exception for elected county officials; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; providing an exception for elected county officials; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseApproved by Governor 05/02/2017
2017-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2017-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2017-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Bice
2017-04-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2017-04-06SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanislawski
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2017-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Griffin
2017-04-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Quinn
2017-03-29SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2017-03-29SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2017-03-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-03-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11
2017-03-13HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen
2017-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Coody, Bennett (John), Calvey, ODonnell, Faught, Murdock, Gann, Roberts (Dustin), Jordan, Tadlock, Teague, McEachin, Babinec, Newton, Dunlap, West (Kevin), West (Rick), Roberts (Sean), Wallace, Osborn (Leslie), Humphrey, Rogers, Enns, Ford, Murphey, Hilbert
2017-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-16HouseAuthored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
2017-02-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, McDugle, Moore
2017-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Cleveland
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1104 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback