OK HB1102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Crime victims; expanding list of rights for crime victims to include notification requirements and participation in certain proceedings; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victims; expanding list of rights for crime victims to include notification requirements and participation in certain proceedings; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-16HouseTo Senate
2019-05-16HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 25
2019-05-16HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-15HouseEnacting clause restored
2019-05-15HouseTitle restored
2019-05-15HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Daniels, Jech, Weaver, Sharp, Brooks, Boren
2019-04-23HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-09SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8
2019-03-12HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Osburn
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1102&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1102%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1102%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1102%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1102%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1102%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1102%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1102%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1102_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1102_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback