OK HB1092 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Small claims procedure; clarifying limits for awarding attorney fees in uncontested cases; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small claims procedure; clarifying limits for awarding attorney fees in uncontested cases; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Osburn
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback