OK HB1089 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; Supplemental Hospital Offset Payment Program; Hospital Advisory Committee; termination date extension; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; Supplemental Hospital Offset Payment Program; Hospital Advisory Committee; termination date extension; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-10HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-09SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-04-09SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2019-04-09SenateTitle restored
2019-04-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-03SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Montgomery
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-04-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Josh)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback