OK HB1085 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; modifying pretrial release conditions to include various monitoring and testing methods; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; modifying pretrial release conditions to include various monitoring and testing methods; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 13 |
2013-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Grau |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |