OK HB1074 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1074
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; requiring Department of Human Services to verify applicability and conduct nationwide search for placement purposes; effective date.
Title
Children; requiring Department of Human Services to verify applicability and conduct nationwide search for placement purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Approved by Governor 04/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stark |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Bennett, Lawson, Mize, Pae, Randleman, Smith, Hasenbeck, Grego, Rosecrants, Fugate |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1074 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019