OK HB1071 | 2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1071

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; increasing certain highway speed limits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; increasing certain highway speed limits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-11HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-11SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-11HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-10HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-10SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 16
2019-04-10SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2019-04-10SenateTitle restored
2019-04-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-26SenateTitle stricken
2019-03-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 12
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-03-06HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-03-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Hill
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Pae
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1071 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback