OK HB1071 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Statutes and reports; relating to the Administrative Procedures Act; modifying notice requirements; modifying appointments to the Small Business Regulatory Review Committee. Effective date.
Title
Statutes and reports; relating to the Administrative Procedures Act; modifying notice requirements; modifying appointments to the Small Business Regulatory Review Committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Agency Oversight: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Agency Oversight: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-12 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-12 | Authored by Senator Brogdon (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-12 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules and Agency Oversight Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Agency Oversight | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Wright (John) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
75 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |