OK HB1066 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; requiring the Oklahoma Employment Security Commission to create certain phone number; effective date.
Title
Labor; requiring the Oklahoma Employment Security Commission to create certain phone number; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Lockhart | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |