OK HB1065 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1065
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; school safety; modifying definition of threatening behavior; effective date.
Title
Schools; school safety; modifying definition of threatening behavior; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Johns |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1065 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Education