OK HB1062 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1062
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; homesteads; disabled veterans; surviving spouses; improvements; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; homesteads; disabled veterans; surviving spouses; improvements; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Dick Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance-Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance-Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Approved by Governor 05/04/2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-28 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Bell |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Lowe (Dick) |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Boles |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1062 (Carry Over) 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021