OK HB1058 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1058
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying minimum municipal income for which certain audits shall be required; creating revolving fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying minimum municipal income for which certain audits shall be required; creating revolving fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Boles |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1058 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to General Government