OK HB1057 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1057
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; providing for licensed psychologists to practice in member states; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; providing for licensed psychologists to practice in member states; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire |
2019-02-26 | House | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kiger |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1057 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019