OK HB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1056
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic assault; required minimum sentence; adding offense to list of crimes; deleting penalty option for certain prohibited act; effective date.
Title
Domestic assault; required minimum sentence; adding offense to list of crimes; deleting penalty option for certain prohibited act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Ayes: 54 Nays: 18 |
2019-03-06 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-06 | House | Amended |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1056 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee