OK HB1055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1055
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sellers of food; creating and requiring certain permit; fees; sales tax; emergency.
Title
Sellers of food; creating and requiring certain permit; fees; sales tax; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Emergency added |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Bush |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1055 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019