OK HB1051 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1051
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing local school districts to conduct an annual fitness assessment.
Title
Schools; directing local school districts to conduct an annual fitness assessment.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Sterling [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] |
Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] |
Rep. John Talley [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 31 |
2020-03-11 | House | Emergency removed |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Pae, Talley, Roe, Loring, Boles, Dollens, Davis |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Sterling |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1051 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - Emergency added