OK HB1051 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1051
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing local school districts to conduct an annual fitness assessment; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; directing local school districts to conduct an annual fitness assessment; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Sterling |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1051 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - Emergency added