OK HB1051 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Safe Sports School Act; effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the Safe Sports School Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 26 |
2015-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2015-02-25 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 24 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 24 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |