OK HB1050 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; fair association elections; modifying filing procedure; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; fair association elections; modifying filing procedure; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Died in conference | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Ballenger, Johnson (Rob), Wyrick, Anderson, Justice, Barrington | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-04-12 | SA's received | |
2011-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | |
2011-04-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sanders | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |